ID H0093 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONCEALED WEAPONS -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding who may carry a concealed weapon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding who may carry a concealed weapon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:20 a.m. on March 24, 2017
2017-03-24HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-23SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-23SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-20Senateto House
2017-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2017-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2017-03-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-06Houseto Senate
2017-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-06HousePASSED 65-2-3
2017-03-06HouseMotion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed
2017-03-06HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times
2017-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-03HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-02HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2017-02-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback