ID H0080 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain agreements and compensation for damage by pronghorn antelope, elk, deer, and moose.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain agreements and compensation for damage by pronghorn antelope, elk, deer, and moose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-13 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2019-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |