ID H0080 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law to define when corporate officers are unemployed; and to allow corporations to exempt corporate officers from unemployment insurance coverage.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to define when corporate officers are unemployed; and to allow corporations to exempt corporate officers from unemployment insurance coverage.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-15 | Delivered to Governor on 03/14 | |
2011-03-14 | To Governor | |
2011-03-11 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-09 | To enrol | |
2011-03-08 | to House | |
2011-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-21 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-21 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-18 | to Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 55-7-8 | |
2011-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-02 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-02-02 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-01 | to printing | |
2011-02-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-01 | House intro |