ID H0070 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 69 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 69 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Adds to existing law to provide legislative intent and to provide for the award of STEM (science, technology, engineering and mathematics) school or STEM program designation.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide legislative intent and to provide for the award of STEM (science, technology, engineering and mathematics) school or STEM program designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 69 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-3-2 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-2-5 |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |