ID H0060 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2023 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2023 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
USE TAXES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding application of use taxes to articles acquired more than 90 days prior.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding application of use taxes to articles acquired more than 90 days prior.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2023 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2023 |
2023-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2023-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2023-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |