ID H0045 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to engineers and surveyors to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to disciplinary actions and procedures; to revise provisions relating to the reissuance of licenses and to provide requirements relating to the reissuance of wall certificates.
Title
Amends existing law relating to engineers and surveyors to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to disciplinary actions and procedures; to revise provisions relating to the reissuance of licenses and to provide requirements relating to the reissuance of wall certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on April 2, 2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-07 | House | Clow |
2013-03-07 | House | 70-0-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-07 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2013-03-07 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-05 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-05 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-06 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2013-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |