ID H0039 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - U.C. to be returned to Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - U.C. to be returned to Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO BUILDING CODE ACT -- Amends existing law to provide for building plans examiners, to remove reference to the International Conference of Building Officials, and to revise a provision regarding inspector certification.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for building plans examiners, to remove reference to the International Conference of Building Officials, and to revise a provision regarding inspector certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | U.C. to be returned to Local Government Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Local Government |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0039/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0039.pdf |