ID H0032 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX -- Amends existing law to increase to 90 days the amount of time a tax-exempt motor vehicle purchased by a nonresident may be used in Idaho.
Title
Amends existing law to increase to 90 days the amount of time a tax-exempt motor vehicle purchased by a nonresident may be used in Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2017-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |