ID H0002 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-27 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-27 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NO FUNDS FOR ABORTION ACT -- Amends, adds to, and repeals existing law to provide for the withholding of sales and use tax revenues from local government entities that defy state law and refuse to investigate or enforce Idaho criminal abortion statutes.
Title
Amends, adds to, and repeals existing law to provide for the withholding of sales and use tax revenues from local government entities that defy state law and refuse to investigate or enforce Idaho criminal abortion statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, January 27, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-01-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |