ID H0001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2017 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 02/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2017 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 02/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT -- Amends existing law to provide legislative intent and to provide for the legislative review for parts of a rule.
Title
Amends existing law to provide legislative intent and to provide for the legislative review for parts of a rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2017 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 02/13/2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on February 8, 2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-02-02 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-01-19 | House | to Senate |
2017-01-19 | House | Title apvd |
2017-01-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2017-01-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |