IA SSB3214 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2494
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2413
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2413
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund, and providing for other properly related matters.
Title
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund, and providing for other properly related matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Sub |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Bolkcom, Boulton, Breitbach, Chelgren, Costello, Danielson, Dotzler, Garrett, Greene, Guth, Hart, Johnson, C., Kraayenbrink, Lofgren, Mathis, McCoy, Ragan, Rozenboom, Shipley and Zumbach. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2494 (Replaced by) 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
SF2413 (Replaced by) 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1008.
HSB695 (Related) 2018-04-17 - NOBA: House Sub
SF2413 (Replaced by) 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1008.
HSB695 (Related) 2018-04-17 - NOBA: House Sub
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3214 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3214.html |