IA SSB3194 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2430
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the correction and substitution of death certificates.(See SF 2430.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the correction and substitution of death certificates.(See SF 2430.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2430. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Dawson, and Winckler. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2430 (Replaced by) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3194 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3194.html |