IA SSB3187 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2004
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2004.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2004.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution designating the honeybee as the official state insect for the State of Iowa.
Title
A joint resolution designating the honeybee as the official state insect for the State of Iowa.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2004. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Giddens, and Smith, R. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2004 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 586.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3187 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3187.html |