IA SSB3185 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing immunity for the operation of manufacturing or industrial facilities under certain circumstances and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing immunity for the operation of manufacturing or industrial facilities under certain circumstances and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 10:30AM RM G17. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Hogg, and Shipley. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3185 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3185.html |