IA SSB3178 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2310
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act modifying the rebate of sales and use tax to the owner or operator of a raceway facility.
Title
A study bill for an act modifying the rebate of sales and use tax to the owner or operator of a raceway facility.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | 8:30AM; RM 206 Ways and Means. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Ways and Means: Dotzler Chair,Allen, and Feenstra. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | In Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2310 (Replaced by) 2016-04-29 - Motions to reconsider vote failed. S.J. 0.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3178 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3178.html |