IA SSB3161 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2380
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2610
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2610
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the duties of the secretary of state, including the address confidentiality program and the conduct of elections.(See SF 2380.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the duties of the secretary of state, including the address confidentiality program and the conduct of elections.(See SF 2380.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 12:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Driscoll, and Weiner. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB697 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2610.
SF2380 (Replaced by) 2024-03-26 - Amendment S-5104 filed. S.J. 646.
HF2610 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Fiscal note.
SF2380 (Replaced by) 2024-03-26 - Amendment S-5104 filed. S.J. 646.
HF2610 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3161 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3161.html |