IA SSB3154 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2372
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state taxation and administration by modifying sales and use taxes, individual and corporate income taxes, the automobile rental excise tax, the franchise tax, and the insurance premiums tax, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 2372.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state taxation and administration by modifying sales and use taxes, individual and corporate income taxes, the automobile rental excise tax, the franchise tax, and the insurance premiums tax, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 2372.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2372. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/08/2022 11:30AM Room G15. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Goodwin. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2372 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3154 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3154.html |