IA SSB3151 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2328
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use capacity of campground septic systems.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use capacity of campground septic systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Trone Garriott, and Zumbach. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB600 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2328.
HF2328 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
HF2328 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3151 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3151.html |