IA SSB3148 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2253
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to certain disclosure requirements for the transfer of real estate involving limited liability companies.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to certain disclosure requirements for the transfer of real estate involving limited liability companies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Commerce. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 10:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Commerce. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Commerce: Allen Chair,Anderson, and Schoenjahn. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | In Commerce |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2253 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 471.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3148 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3148.html |