IA SSB3146 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2370
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring county commissions of veteran affairs to contact discharged veterans regarding veteran benefits.
Title
A bill for an act requiring county commissions of veteran affairs to contact discharged veterans regarding veteran benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2370. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 10:00AM RM G17. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Edler, and Taylor, R. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2370 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 405.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3146.html |