IA SSB3138 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2502
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to firearms and weapons, including the storage, carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons and the establishment, use, and maintenance of shooting ranges.
Title
A bill for an act relating to firearms and weapons, including the storage, carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons and the establishment, use, and maintenance of shooting ranges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM RM G17. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Sinclair. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB615 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
HF2502 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HF2502 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3138 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3138.html |