IA SSB3135 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2359
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to evidence offered to prove past medical expenses.
Title
A bill for an act relating to evidence offered to prove past medical expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 2:30PM RM 315. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Hogg, and Sweeney. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2359 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 376.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3135 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3135.html |