IA SSB3124 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2383
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2310
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2310
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to multiple housing cooperatives, including by providing for the conversion to a cooperative under the Iowa cooperative associations Act and merger with a limited liability company.(See SF 2310.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to multiple housing cooperatives, including by providing for the conversion to a cooperative under the Iowa cooperative associations Act and merger with a limited liability company.(See SF 2310.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 8:45AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Williams, Koelker, and Lykam. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2383 (Replaced by) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 249.
SF2310 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 836.
SF2310 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 836.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3124 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3124.html |