IA SSB3122 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the collection of fees and the performance of background investigations under the medical cannabidiol Act, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the collection of fees and the performance of background investigations under the medical cannabidiol Act, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Garrett, and Bolkcom. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2301 (Replaced by) 2018-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2432 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
SF2397 (Replaced by) 2018-04-16 - Amendment S-5245 filed. S.J. 946.
HSB652 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 9:00AM House Lounge
HF2432 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
SF2397 (Replaced by) 2018-04-16 - Amendment S-5245 filed. S.J. 946.
HSB652 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 9:00AM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3122.html |