IA SSB3122 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2271
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2271
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2271
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of identity theft, and providing penalties.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of identity theft, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 1:30PM; Room 206 Judiciary. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary: Kinney Chair,Hogg, and Shipley. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB523 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF2271 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 457.
SF2271 (Replaced by) 2016-02-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 396.
HF2271 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 457.
SF2271 (Replaced by) 2016-02-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 396.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3122.html |