IA SSB3105 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2255
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the application of the certificate of need process only to nursing facilities.(See SF 2255.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the application of the certificate of need process only to nursing facilities.(See SF 2255.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2255. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 3:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Jochum. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2255 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 621.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3105 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3105.html |