IA SSB3102 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to property law, including manufactured or mobile home retailer licenses, rent, rental agreements, notice requirements, and possession of property.
Title
A bill for an act relating to property law, including manufactured or mobile home retailer licenses, rent, rental agreements, notice requirements, and possession of property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2024 8:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Dawson, and Jochum. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3102 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3102.html |