IA SSB3097 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2251
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning restrictions on workforce advertising by state agencies.(See SF 2251.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning restrictions on workforce advertising by state agencies.(See SF 2251.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2251. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 2:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Dickey, and Dotzler. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2251 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 621.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3097 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3097.html |