IA SSB3087 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2327
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2458
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2458
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a future ready Iowa Act to strengthen workforce development by establishing a registered apprenticeship development program, a volunteer mentoring program, a summer youth intern program, summer postsecondary courses for high school students that are aligned with high-demand career pathways, an employer innovation fund, and future ready Iowa skilled workforce scholarship and grant programs and funds, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating a future ready Iowa Act to strengthen workforce development by establishing a registered apprenticeship development program, a volunteer mentoring program, a summer youth intern program, summer postsecondary courses for high school students that are aligned with high-demand career pathways, an employer innovation fund, and future ready Iowa skilled workforce scholarship and grant programs and funds, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 116 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: C. Johnson, Chapman, and McCoy. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2327 (Replaced by) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 703.
HF2458 (Replaced by) 2018-04-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 733.
HSB602 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:30AM House Lounge
HF2458 (Replaced by) 2018-04-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 733.
HSB602 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:30AM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3087 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3087.html |