IA SSB3082 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2509
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to forensic scientific evidence and postconviction relief.
Title
A bill for an act relating to forensic scientific evidence and postconviction relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Kinney, and Schultz. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB567 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 321.
HF2509 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 333.
HF2509 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 333.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3082 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3082.html |