IA SSB3073 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2386
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to the number of area education agencies in this state, the duties and powers of area education agencies, area education agency boards of directors, the department of administrative services, the director of the department of education, the division of special education within the department of education, the services provided by area education agencies, area education agency funding, the calculation of the teacher salary supplement district cost per pupil, and minimum teacher salaries, and including transition, effective date, and applicability provisions.(See SF 2386.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to the number of area education agencies in this state, the duties and powers of area education agencies, area education agency boards of directors, the department of administrative services, the director of the department of education, the division of special education within the department of education, the services provided by area education agencies, area education agency funding, the calculation of the teacher salary supplement district cost per pupil, and minimum teacher salaries, and including transition, effective date, and applicability provisions.(See SF 2386.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 2:00PM Room G15. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Evans, Donahue, and Rozenboom. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB542 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 3-0.
SF2386 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 549.
SF2386 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 549.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3073 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3073.html |