IA SSB3073 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances and precursor substances, including provisions relating to the registration of persons who manufacture, distribute, or dispense controlled substances, adding substances to the controlled substance schedules, expanding the list of precursor substances for which reporting is required, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances and precursor substances, including provisions relating to the registration of persons who manufacture, distribute, or dispense controlled substances, adding substances to the controlled substance schedules, expanding the list of precursor substances for which reporting is required, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2018 10:45AM RM 315 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Segebart, and Mathis. S.J. 156. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 693.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3073 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3073.html |