IA SSB3070 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2203
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the board of nursing to issue a limited nursing authorization to a nurse to complete the clinical component of a nurse refresher course.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the board of nursing to issue a limited nursing authorization to a nurse to complete the clinical component of a nurse refresher course.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2018 10:00AM RM 315 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Segebart, and Mathis. S.J. 156. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2203 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3070 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3070.html |