IA SSB3069 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2233
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2233.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2233.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of dental hygienists and dental assistants, and the practice of dentistry, and providing administrative penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of dental hygienists and dental assistants, and the practice of dentistry, and providing administrative penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2233. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 11:00AM RM G17. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano, and Miller-Meeks. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2233 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 512.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3069 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3069.html |