IA SSB3056 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2378
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - 11:00AM; ROOM 206 Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - 11:00AM; ROOM 206 Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the time period during which a vacation or appeal of a termination of parental rights order may be requested.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the time period during which a vacation or appeal of a termination of parental rights order may be requested.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | 11:00AM; ROOM 206 Judiciary. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Judiciary: Taylor Chair,Petersen, and Zaun. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3057 (Related) 2016-01-28 - 11:30AM; ROOM 206 Judiciary.
HSB520 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF2378 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 456.
HSB520 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF2378 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 456.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3056 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3056.html |