IA SSB3054 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2171
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2170
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2170
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to stopping payment on a negotiable instrument by using an electronic record in lieu of a writing.
Title
A bill for an act relating to stopping payment on a negotiable instrument by using an electronic record in lieu of a writing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2018 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Guth, and Mathis. S.J. 146. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2171 (Replaced by) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 661.
HSB532 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 661.
HSB532 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3054 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3054.html |