IA SSB3053 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2301
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2531
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2531
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Reichman. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB602 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2301.
HF2301 (Replaced by) 2022-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2531.
HF2531 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Fiscal note.
HF2301 (Replaced by) 2022-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2531.
HF2531 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3053 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3053.html |