IA SSB3053 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2258
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to verification of guardianship for purposes of enrolling a child in a school district.
Title
A bill for an act relating to verification of guardianship for purposes of enrolling a child in a school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2258. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 9:45AM RM 315. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Giddens, and Johnson. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF2258 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 309.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3053 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3053.html |