IA SSB3046 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to reading and literacy requirements for practitioner preparation programs.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to reading and literacy requirements for practitioner preparation programs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | Senate | Voted - Education. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 12:00PM; RM 22 Education. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Education: Quirmbach Chair,Behn, and Hart. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | In Education |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2119 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 546.
HSB545 (Related) 2016-02-15 - Voted - Education.
SF2196 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 654.
HF2422 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 546.
HSB545 (Related) 2016-02-15 - Voted - Education.
SF2196 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 654.
HF2422 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 546.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3046 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3046.html |