IA SSB3041 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2151
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2365
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2365
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education by modifying provisions related to a process for investigating complaints against school employees and the responsibilities of the department of education and the board of educational examiners.(See SF 2365.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education by modifying provisions related to a process for investigating complaints against school employees and the responsibilities of the department of education and the board of educational examiners.(See SF 2365.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2365. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Donahue, and Gruenhagen. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB566 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2151.
HF2151 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 139.
SF2365 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
HF2151 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 139.
SF2365 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3041 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3041.html |