IA SSB3033 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to preexisting condition exclusions in certain coverage for health care services, and including effective and applicability date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to preexisting condition exclusions in certain coverage for health care services, and including effective and applicability date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:00PM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Dawson, and Petersen. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3033 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3033.html |