IA SSB3028 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2274
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the records of the Iowa public broadcasting board.(See SF 2274.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the records of the Iowa public broadcasting board.(See SF 2274.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 2:00PM Room G17. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Bisignano, Reichman, and Smith, R. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Bisignano, and Schultz. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2274 (Replaced by) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3028 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3028.html |