IA SSB3020 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2241
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2338
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2338
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the apportionment of district associate judges.(See SF 2241.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the apportionment of district associate judges.(See SF 2241.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2241. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 1:30PM Room G17. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Schultz. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB591 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2338.
SF2241 (Replaced by) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
HF2338 (Replaced by) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
SF2241 (Replaced by) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
HF2338 (Replaced by) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3020 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3020.html |