IA SSB3013 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2273
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2473

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2273.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test in a private-sector workplace for employment purposes and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test in a private-sector workplace for employment purposes and providing penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2273.
2020-01-23SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 9:30AM RM G17.
2020-01-15SenateSubcommittee: Nunn, Bolkcom, and Breitbach.
2020-01-15SenateBy COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE

Same As/Similar To

HSB539 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 297.
SF2273 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Attached to companion HF 2473. S.J. 526.
HF2473 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2273. S.J. 526.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback