IA SSB3013 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - 11:30AM; 206 State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - 11:30AM; 206 State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to permissible gifts from restricted donors to public officials, public employees, candidates, and immediate family members of such persons.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to permissible gifts from restricted donors to public officials, public employees, candidates, and immediate family members of such persons.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | 11:30AM; 206 State Government. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | State Government: Danielson Chair,Bertrand, and Horn. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | In State Government |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB512 (Related) 2016-01-19 - State Government: Highfill Chair,Kelley, and Watts.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3013 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3013.html |