IA SSB3002 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2022
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to criminal jurisdiction on the Sac and Fox Indian settlement.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to criminal jurisdiction on the Sac and Fox Indian settlement.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | 3:30PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Judiciary: Sodders Chair,Hogg, and Schneider. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2022 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 649.
HSB526 (Related) 2016-01-27 - 2:00PM; House Lounge Judiciary.
HSB526 (Related) 2016-01-27 - 2:00PM; House Lounge Judiciary.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3002 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3002.html |