IA SSB1221 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the maximum gross weight allowed for commercial motor vehicles operating on noninterstate highways.
Title
A bill for an act increasing the maximum gross weight allowed for commercial motor vehicles operating on noninterstate highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 4:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Bisignano, and Brown. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1221 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1221.html |