IA SSB1195 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF483
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act limiting local legislation that prohibits the operation of an animal enterprise or the use of a working animal.(See SF 483.)
Title
A bill for an act limiting local legislation that prohibits the operation of an animal enterprise or the use of a working animal.(See SF 483.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 483. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Kinney. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
SF483 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 727.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1195 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1195.html |