IA SSB1183 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for veterinary medicine, including the care of animals under the supervision of a licensed veterinarian, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 541.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for veterinary medicine, including the care of animals under the supervision of a licensed veterinarian, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 541.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 12:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Dotzler, and Green. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB139 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 640.
SF541 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.
HF640 (Replaced by) 2023-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 824.
HF670 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
SF541 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.
HF640 (Replaced by) 2023-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 824.
HF670 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1183 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1183.html |