IA SSB1180 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF512
Note: Legislation replaced by SF418
Note: Legislation replaced by SF418
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Voted - Agriculture.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Voted - Agriculture.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act providing for the determination of animal units which are part of confinement feeding operations, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A study bill for an act providing for the determination of animal units which are part of confinement feeding operations, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Voted - Agriculture. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Agriculture: Seng Chair,Sodders, and Zumbach. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | In Agriculture |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB171 (Related) 2013-03-04 - Voted - Agriculture.
HF512 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
SF418 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
HF512 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
SF418 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS